SD HB1046 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 850
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 850
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions for the procurement of goods and services for governmental agencies.
Title
Revise certain provisions for the procurement of goods and services for governmental agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Government Operations and Audit Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - State Affairs Referred as Amended to House Government Operations and Audit (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Removed from table (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Tabled (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Government Operations and Audit Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - State Affairs Referred as Amended to House Government Operations and Audit (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Removed from table (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Tabled (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-12 | Signed by Governor H.J. 850 | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 846 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by President S.J. 644 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 801 | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 9. S.J. 590 | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 573 | |
2010-03-03 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 2. S.J. 542 | |
2010-03-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-24 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 459 | |
2010-02-23 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 5. H.J. 590 | |
2010-02-22 | Government Operations and Audit Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. H.J. 506 | |
2010-02-22 | Government Operations and Audit Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 1046op | |
2010-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-17 | State Affairs Referred as Amended to House Government Operations and Audit, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 412 | |
2010-02-17 | State Affairs Removed from table, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. | |
2010-02-03 | State Affairs Tabled, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 283 | |
2010-02-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-27 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1046od | |
2010-01-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-12 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 27 |