SD HB1045 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the definition of campus security officers for purposes of the South Dakota Retirement System.
Title
Revise the definition of campus security officers for purposes of the South Dakota Retirement System.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] | Sen. Jim White [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 426 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 12, 2019 H.J. 366 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 336 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 346 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 302 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 275 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-29 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Retirement Laws S.J. 215 |
2019-01-28 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 221 |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-24 | House | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. |
2019-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-14 | House | First read in House and referred to House Retirement Laws H.J. 51 |