SD HB1044 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2020 H.J. 626
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2020 H.J. 626
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to the Board of Regents to fund the development of the Cyber Incubator and Entrepreneurial Center at Dakota State University and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to the Board of Regents to fund the development of the Cyber Incubator and Entrepreneurial Center at Dakota State University and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2020 H.J. 626 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 491 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 458 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 437 |
2020-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 11. H.J. 472 |
2020-03-02 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 3. |
2020-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 74 |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 27 |
2020-01-14 | House | First Reading House H.J. 11 |