SD HB1043 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 H.J. 880
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 H.J. 880
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the state aid to special education formula.
Title
Revise the state aid to special education formula.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 H.J. 880 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 860 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 845 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 572 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 555 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 531 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on calendar, Passed S.J. 504 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 504 |
2016-03-01 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 739 |
2016-02-29 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. H.J. 711 |
2016-02-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-19 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 62 |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 36 |
2016-01-12 | House | First Reading House H.J. 23 |