SD HB1043 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-14 - Signed by Governor H.J. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-14 - Signed by Governor H.J. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify the jurisdictional amount in a small claims court proceeding.
Title
Clarify the jurisdictional amount in a small claims court proceeding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-14 | Signed by Governor H.J. 364 | |
2011-02-10 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 359 | |
2011-02-09 | Signed by President S.J. 390 | |
2011-02-08 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 329 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 335 | |
2011-02-03 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-02-03 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 314 | |
2011-02-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-26 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 215 | |
2011-01-25 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 175 | |
2011-01-24 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-01-24 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 135 | |
2011-01-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-18 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 97 |