SD HB1042 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2021 H.J. 396
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2021 H.J. 396
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding riparian buffer strips
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding riparian buffer strips
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2021 H.J. 396 |
2021-02-22 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 22, 2021 H.J. 326 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 297 |
2021-02-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 307 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 261 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 201 |
2021-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 217 |
2021-02-02 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-02 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1042B |
2021-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-12 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 1 |