SD HB1041 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Signed by the Governor on March 02, 2020 H.J. 445
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Signed by the Governor on March 02, 2020 H.J. 445
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions authorizing state employees to opt-out of the state employee health plan and to declare an emergency.
Title
Revise provisions authorizing state employees to opt-out of the state employee health plan and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 02, 2020 H.J. 445 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 26, 2020 H.J. 396 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 344 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 370 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 311 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 142 |
2020-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 1. H.J. 120 |
2020-01-29 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2020-01-29 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1041B |
2020-01-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 36 |
2020-01-14 | House | First Reading House H.J. 11 |