SD HB1039 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation for costs related to suppression of wildfires in the state and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation for costs related to suppression of wildfires in the state and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570 |
2021-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 445 |
2021-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 502 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 403 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 224 |
2021-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 243 |
2021-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 229 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 48 |
2021-01-12 | House | First Reading House H.J. 10 |
Subjects
Agriculture and Horticulture
Appropriation
Emergency Clause
Executive/Judiciary Request
Natural Resources
Appropriation
Emergency Clause
Executive/Judiciary Request
Natural Resources