SD HB1039 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 26, 2020 H.J. 418
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 26, 2020 H.J. 418
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the rule-making authority of the Human Resources Commissioner regarding the drug screening program for certain state employees.
Title
Revise the rule-making authority of the Human Resources Commissioner regarding the drug screening program for certain state employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 26, 2020 H.J. 418 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 21, 2020 H.J. 347 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 297 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 323 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 239 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-04 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 132 |
2020-01-30 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 105 |
2020-01-29 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-01-29 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2020-01-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 29 |
2020-01-14 | House | First Reading House H.J. 11 |