SD HB1038 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 06, 2024 H.J. 484
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 06, 2024 H.J. 484
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exclude certain habitual DUI offenders from eligibility for presumptive probation.
Title
Exclude certain habitual DUI offenders from eligibility for presumptive probation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - House - Concurred in amendments (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 06, 2024 H.J. 484 |
2024-02-28 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 28, 2024 H.J. 420 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 436 |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 406 |
2024-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 385 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 376 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1038C |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 167 |
2024-01-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 157 |
2024-01-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 148 |
2024-01-19 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 96 |
2024-01-17 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2024-01-17 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1038A |
2024-01-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-09 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 19 |