SD HB1038 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Signed by the Governor on February 17, 2017 H.J. 424
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Signed by the Governor on February 17, 2017 H.J. 424
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal the requirement for farm corporations to file farm annual reports with the secretary of state.
Title
Repeal the requirement for farm corporations to file farm annual reports with the secretary of state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 17, 2017 H.J. 424 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 16, 2017 H.J. 421 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 406 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 394 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 8. S.J. 376 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 354 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 183 |
2017-01-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 10. H.J. 165 |
2017-01-20 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 100 |
2017-01-19 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 82 |
2017-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-10 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 24 |