SD HB1037 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-24 - Signed by Governor H.J. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-24 - Signed by Governor H.J. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the purpose of the agriculture mediation program.
Title
Revise the purpose of the agriculture mediation program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-24 | Signed by Governor H.J. 594 | |
2012-02-22 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 559 | |
2012-02-21 | Signed by President S.J. 491 | |
2012-02-16 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 513 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 445 | |
2012-02-14 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-14 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 403 | |
2012-02-14 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-09 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-01 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 244 | |
2012-01-31 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 262 | |
2012-01-26 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-01-26 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 212 | |
2012-01-26 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-10 | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 22 |