SD HB1037 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Signed by Governor H.J. 438
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Signed by Governor H.J. 438
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain posting requirements relating to hunting in the Black Hills Fire Protection District.
Title
Revise certain posting requirements relating to hunting in the Black Hills Fire Protection District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Signed by Governor H.J. 438 | |
2011-02-15 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 404 | |
2011-02-14 | Signed by President S.J. 423 | |
2011-02-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 359 | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 378 | |
2011-02-08 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-02-08 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 353 | |
2011-01-25 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 202 | |
2011-01-24 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 157 | |
2011-01-21 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 132 | |
2011-01-20 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 117 | |
2011-01-20 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-14 | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 80 |