SD HB1035 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 H.J. 760
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Rename the unemployment insurance program to the reemployment assistance program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rename the unemployment insurance program to the reemployment assistance program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 20, 2019 H.J. 760
2019-03-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 706
2019-03-11SenateSigned by the President S.J. 675
2019-03-07SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 701
2019-03-06SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 6. S.J. 635
2019-03-05SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 604
2019-03-05SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-28SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-06SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 279
2019-02-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 16. H.J. 294
2019-01-31HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 283
2019-01-22HouseFiscal Note Requested, Passed H.J. 151
2019-01-17HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 141
2019-01-16HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 128
2019-01-16HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 23

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback