SD HB1035 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-24 - Signed by Governor H.J. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-24 - Signed by Governor H.J. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow the disclosure of the status of certain insurance investigations and examinations.
Title
Allow the disclosure of the status of certain insurance investigations and examinations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-24 | Signed by Governor H.J. 594 | |
2012-02-22 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 559 | |
2012-02-21 | Signed by President S.J. 491 | |
2012-02-16 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 513 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 447 | |
2012-02-14 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-14 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 403 | |
2012-02-14 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-06 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 278 | |
2012-02-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 300 | |
2012-01-30 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-01-30 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 235 | |
2012-01-30 | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1035sa | |
2012-01-30 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-10 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 22 |