SD HB1033 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 508
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 508
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal the South Dakota Energy Infrastructure Authority.
Title
Repeal the South Dakota Energy Infrastructure Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 508 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 443 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 423 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 402 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 372 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 352 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 193 |
2015-01-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 162 |
2015-01-23 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-01-23 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 116 |
2015-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 38 |
2015-01-13 | House | First read in House H.J. 28 |