SD HB1029 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-24 - Signed by Governor H.J. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-24 - Signed by Governor H.J. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the publication of the names of certain delinquent taxpayers.
Title
Authorize the publication of the names of certain delinquent taxpayers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-24 | Signed by Governor H.J. 594 | |
2012-02-22 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 559 | |
2012-02-21 | Signed by President S.J. 491 | |
2012-02-16 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 513 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 3. S.J. 455 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 405 | |
2012-02-13 | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 380 | |
2012-02-13 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-06 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 278 | |
2012-02-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 3. H.J. 302 | |
2012-01-31 | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 1. H.J. 256 | |
2012-01-31 | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1029fb | |
2012-01-31 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-26 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-19 | Taxation Deferred to another day, Passed | |
2012-01-19 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-10 | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 20 |