SD HB1029 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - Signed by Governor H.J. 622
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - Signed by Governor H.J. 622
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Board of Social Worker Examiners to deny, suspend, or revoke applications for licensure or licenses under certain circumstances and repeal certain physical examination provisions.
Title
Authorize the Board of Social Worker Examiners to deny, suspend, or revoke applications for licensure or licenses under certain circumstances and repeal certain physical examination provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | Signed by Governor H.J. 622 | |
2010-02-25 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 618 | |
2010-02-24 | Signed by President S.J. 469 | |
2010-02-23 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 591 | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 409 | |
2010-02-19 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-19 | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 383 | |
2010-02-19 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-17 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-27 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 152 | |
2010-01-26 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 184 | |
2010-01-25 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 170 | |
2010-01-21 | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 142 | |
2010-01-21 | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 5. Amendment 1029ja | |
2010-01-21 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-12 | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 24 |