SD HB1028 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2023 H.J. 280
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2023 H.J. 280
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modify expiration dates and enforcement actions pertaining to pesticide applicator licenses.
Title
Modify expiration dates and enforcement actions pertaining to pesticide applicator licenses.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-02-01 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2023 H.J. 280 |
2023-02-06 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 06, 2023 H.J. 230 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 193 |
2023-02-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 215 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 164 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent S.J. 10 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 10 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 91 |
2023-01-20 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 72 |
2023-01-19 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent H.J. 2 |
2023-01-19 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 24 |
2023-01-10 | House | First Reading House H.J. 14 |