SD HB1027 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2022 H.J. 256
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2022 H.J. 256
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Place certain substances on the controlled substances schedule and to declare an emergency.
Title
Place certain substances on the controlled substances schedule and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - Do Pass (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - Do Pass (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2022 H.J. 256 |
2022-02-04 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 04, 2022 H.J. 204 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 176 |
2022-02-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 186 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 142 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 126 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-20 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 83 |
2022-01-19 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 8. H.J. 41 |
2022-01-18 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 3. H.J. 1 |
2022-01-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 21 |
2022-01-11 | House | First Reading House H.J. 7 |