SD HB1027 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Signed by the Governor on February 22, 2021 H.J. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Signed by the Governor on February 22, 2021 H.J. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Identify Water Management Board officers, authorize appointment of a prehearing officer, and define the duties of the prehearing officer.
Title
Identify Water Management Board officers, authorize appointment of a prehearing officer, and define the duties of the prehearing officer.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 22, 2021 H.J. 326 |
2021-02-17 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 17, 2021 H.J. 303 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 271 |
2021-02-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 288 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 240 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 136 |
2021-01-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 1. H.J. 141 |
2021-01-26 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent H.J. 1 |
2021-01-26 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2021-01-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-12 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 1 |
Subjects
Administrative Procedure
Boards and Commissions
Executive/Judiciary Request
Public Officers and Employees
Water Management
Boards and Commissions
Executive/Judiciary Request
Public Officers and Employees
Water Management