SD HB1027 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2018 H.J. 394
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2018 H.J. 394
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the maximum number of apprentices in a salon.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the maximum number of apprentices in a salon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Motion to amend (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Motion to amend (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Motion to amend (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Motion to amend (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2018 H.J. 394 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 07, 2018 H.J. 366 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 394 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 347 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 334 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 284 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-19 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 159 |
2018-01-18 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 96 |
2018-01-16 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2018-01-16 | House | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 3. Amendment 1027ca |
2018-01-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 22 |