SD HB1026 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Signed by the Governor on March 02, 2020 H.J. 445
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Signed by the Governor on March 02, 2020 H.J. 445
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to use of security for cleanup and remediation of environmental problems.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to use of security for cleanup and remediation of environmental problems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 02, 2020 H.J. 445 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 26, 2020 H.J. 396 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 344 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 370 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 306 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-06 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 157 |
2020-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 183 |
2020-02-04 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 38 |
2020-01-14 | House | First Reading House H.J. 11 |