SD HB1026 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Signed by the Governor on February 17, 2017 H.J. 424
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Signed by the Governor on February 17, 2017 H.J. 424
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require tracking numbers to be included on the quarterly reports of direct shippers and of wine carriers.
Title
Require tracking numbers to be included on the quarterly reports of direct shippers and of wine carriers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 17, 2017 H.J. 424 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 16, 2017 H.J. 421 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 406 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 394 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 1. S.J. 374 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 353 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 232 |
2017-01-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 218 |
2017-01-25 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2017-01-25 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 186 |
2017-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-10 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 22 |