SD HB1023 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Signed by the Governor on February 22, 2018 H.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal certain provisions regarding pipeline safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal certain provisions regarding pipeline safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22SenateSigned by the Governor on February 22, 2018 H.J. 544
2018-02-21SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 21, 2018 H.J. 520
2018-02-20SenateSigned by the President S.J. 513
2018-02-12SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 413
2018-02-07SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 403
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2018-02-06SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 382
2018-02-06SenateScheduled for hearing
2018-01-23SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 201
2018-01-22HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 0. H.J. 132
2018-01-19HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2018-01-19HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 106
2018-01-19HouseScheduled for hearing
2018-01-09HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 21

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1023&Session=2018
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/HB1023P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/HB1023ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24658&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24719&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24658&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24719&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25409&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25522&Session=2018

Bill Comments

feedback