SD HB1023 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-09 - Signed by Governor H.J. 320
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-09 - Signed by Governor H.J. 320
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain requirements regarding make up time for school districts.
Title
Revise certain requirements regarding make up time for school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | Signed by Governor H.J. 320 | |
2010-02-04 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 317 | |
2010-02-03 | Signed by President S.J. 241 | |
2010-02-02 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 277 | |
2010-02-01 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 193 | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-01-28 | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 159 | |
2010-01-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-20 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 96 | |
2010-01-19 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 113 | |
2010-01-15 | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 52 | |
2010-01-15 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-12 | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 22 |