SD HB1021 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to the State Conservation Commission and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to the State Conservation Commission and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Joint - Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Joint - Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 544 |
2023-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2023 H.J. 509 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 447 |
2023-03-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 489 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 391 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 368 |
2023-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 5. H.J. 387 |
2023-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 374 |
2023-02-22 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. J.J. 9 |
2023-02-22 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1 |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 24 |
2023-01-10 | House | First Reading House H.J. 14 |
Subjects
Agriculture and Horticulture
Appropriation
Boards and Commissions
Emergency Clause
Executive/Judiciary Request
Water Management
Appropriation
Boards and Commissions
Emergency Clause
Executive/Judiciary Request
Water Management