SD HB1021 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 656
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 656
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Board of Regents to acquire property, contract for the design and construction of an athletics events center at Dakota State University, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Authorize the Board of Regents to acquire property, contract for the design and construction of an athletics events center at Dakota State University, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - Referred to (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - Referred to (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 656 |
2022-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2022 H.J. 594 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 457 |
2022-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 536 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 414 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 328 |
2022-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 413 |
2022-02-16 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. H.J. 1 |
2022-02-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 115 |
2022-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 3. |
2022-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-19 | House | Referred to House Education H.J. 40 |
2022-01-11 | House | First Reading House H.J. 7 |
Subjects
Appropriation
Emergency Clause
Executive/Judiciary Request
Procurement of Public Improvements
Public Property, Purchases and Contracts
Emergency Clause
Executive/Judiciary Request
Procurement of Public Improvements
Public Property, Purchases and Contracts