SD HB1021 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2018 H.J. 352
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2018 H.J. 352
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions related to the practice of podiatry and to authorize certain fee increases.
Title
Revise certain provisions related to the practice of podiatry and to authorize certain fee increases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2018 H.J. 352 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 02, 2018 H.J. 310 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 338 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 266 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 3. S.J. 258 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 219 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-18 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 135 |
2018-01-17 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 13. H.J. 83 |
2018-01-16 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. H.J. 58 |
2018-01-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 21 |