SD HB1021 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-10 - Signed by Governor H.J. 352
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-10 - Signed by Governor H.J. 352
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the inspection of parole files.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the inspection of parole files.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-10 | Signed by Governor H.J. 352 | |
2011-02-08 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 328 | |
2011-02-07 | Signed by President S.J. 347 | |
2011-02-03 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 282 | |
2011-02-02 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 300 | |
2011-02-01 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-02-01 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 271 | |
2011-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-25 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 201 | |
2011-01-24 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 154 | |
2011-01-24 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 154 Amendment 1021ja | |
2011-01-20 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 120 | |
2011-01-14 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. H.J. 90 | |
2011-01-14 | Amend the amendment, Passed Amendment 1021rb | |
2011-01-14 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1021ra | |
2011-01-14 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-11 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 25 |