SD HB1021 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - Signed by Governor H.J. 412
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - Signed by Governor H.J. 412
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the deposit of federal special education funds into the capital outlay fund for the purchase of equipment for the purpose of special education and to declare an emergency.
Title
Authorize the deposit of federal special education funds into the capital outlay fund for the purchase of equipment for the purpose of special education and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-17 | Signed by Governor H.J. 412 | |
2010-02-12 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 387 | |
2010-02-11 | Signed by President S.J. 314 | |
2010-02-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 360 | |
2010-02-09 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 269 | |
2010-02-04 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 250 | |
2010-02-02 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-02 | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 204 | |
2010-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-27 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 152 | |
2010-01-26 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 5. H.J. 182 | |
2010-01-25 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 170 | |
2010-01-22 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 163 | |
2010-01-20 | Education Title amended, Passed Amendment 1021cta | |
2010-01-20 | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 134 | |
2010-01-20 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1021cb | |
2010-01-20 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1021ca | |
2010-01-20 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-15 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-12 | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 22 |