SD HB1020 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2020 H.J. 373
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2020 H.J. 373
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the use of exemption certificates.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the use of exemption certificates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2020 H.J. 373 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 20, 2020 H.J. 326 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 259 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 304 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 230 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 99 |
2020-01-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 65 |
2020-01-24 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 59 |
2020-01-23 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. |
2020-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to House Taxation H.J. 19 |
2020-01-14 | House | First Reading House H.J. 11 |