SD HB1019 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-10 - Signed by Governor H.J. 352
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-10 - Signed by Governor H.J. 352
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Include employees responsible for persons on supervised release or probation and members of the Board of Pardons and Paroles in protections afforded law enforcement and judicial officers.
Title
Include employees responsible for persons on supervised release or probation and members of the Board of Pardons and Paroles in protections afforded law enforcement and judicial officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-10 | Signed by Governor H.J. 352 | |
2011-02-08 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 328 | |
2011-02-07 | Signed by President S.J. 347 | |
2011-02-03 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 282 | |
2011-02-02 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 306 | |
2011-02-01 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 270 | |
2011-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-26 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 214 | |
2011-01-25 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 3. H.J. 177 | |
2011-01-21 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 134 | |
2011-01-21 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-14 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-01-14 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-11 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 24 |