SD HB1017 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Signed by the Governor on February 9, 2017 H.J. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Signed by the Governor on February 9, 2017 H.J. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the definition of compensation for purposes of the South Dakota Retirement System, to provide a penalty for falsely reporting compensation, and to update references to the Internal Revenue Code.
Title
Revise the definition of compensation for purposes of the South Dakota Retirement System, to provide a penalty for falsely reporting compensation, and to update references to the Internal Revenue Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 9, 2017 H.J. 364 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 07, 2017 H.J. 337 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 318 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 297 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 280 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 246 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Retirement Laws S.J. 183 |
2017-01-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 167 |
2017-01-20 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 100 |
2017-01-18 | House | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. H.J. 84 |
2017-01-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-10 | House | First read in House and referred to House Retirement Laws H.J. 20 |