SD HB1014 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to fund tax refunds for elderly persons and persons with a disability and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to fund tax refunds for elderly persons and persons with a disability and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - Concurred in amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688 |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 662 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 509 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 635 |
2022-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 571 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 428 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1014E |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-17 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 294 |
2022-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 347 |
2022-02-15 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 330 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 29 |
2022-01-11 | House | First Reading House H.J. 7 |