SD HB1014 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2020 H.J. 537
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2020 H.J. 537
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Place certain substances on the controlled substances schedule and to declare an emergency.
Title
Place certain substances on the controlled substances schedule and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2020 H.J. 537 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 05, 2020 H.J. 480 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 421 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 458 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 388 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 238 |
2020-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 7. H.J. 281 |
2020-02-12 | House | Remove from Consent Calendar H.J. 271 |
2020-02-11 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-11 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 19 |
2020-01-14 | House | First Reading House H.J. 11 |