SD HB1014 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2018 H.J. 470
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2018 H.J. 470
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the application of the intrastate exemption for certain commercial vehicles from the federal motor carrier regulations.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the application of the intrastate exemption for certain commercial vehicles from the federal motor carrier regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2018 H.J. 470 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 12, 2018 H.J. 403 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 422 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 382 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 10. S.J. 376 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 337 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 283 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-22 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 177 |
2018-01-19 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 0. H.J. 120 |
2018-01-18 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 88 |
2018-01-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 19 |