SD HB1014 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Signed by Governor H.J. 825
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Signed by Governor H.J. 825
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Board of Regents to purchase a structure for use by South Dakota School of Mines and Technology and to make an appropriation therefor.
Title
Authorize the Board of Regents to purchase a structure for use by South Dakota School of Mines and Technology and to make an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 825 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 735 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 655 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 598 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 583 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 551 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-29 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 263 |
2013-01-28 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 222 |
2013-01-24 | House | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 165 |
2013-01-24 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1014ma |
2013-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 23 |