SD HB1014 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-08 - Signed by Governor H.J. 352
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-08 - Signed by Governor H.J. 352
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit false statements on applications for certain loans, grants, or other financial assistance and to provide a penalty therefor.
Title
Prohibit false statements on applications for certain loans, grants, or other financial assistance and to provide a penalty therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | Signed by Governor H.J. 352 | |
2012-02-06 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 327 | |
2012-02-02 | Signed by President S.J. 268 | |
2012-02-01 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 289 | |
2012-01-31 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 236 | |
2012-01-30 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 206 | |
2012-01-30 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 135 | |
2012-01-20 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 3. H.J. 74 | |
2012-01-13 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 3. H.J. 50 | |
2012-01-13 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-10 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 17 |