SD HB1013 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Senate Line Item Veto Consideration, Failed, YEAS 23, NAYS 12. S.J. 571
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Correct technical errors in statutory cross-references.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correct technical errors in statutory cross-references.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-30 - Senate - Senate Line Item Veto Consideration (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-30 - House - House of Representatives Line Item Veto Consideration (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30SenateSenate Line Item Veto Consideration, Failed, YEAS 23, NAYS 12. S.J. 571
2020-03-30SenateHouse of Representatives Line Item Veto Consideration, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 631
2020-03-05SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 05, 2020 H.J. 480
2020-03-04SenateSigned by the President S.J. 421
2020-03-03SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 458
2020-03-02SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 386
2020-02-27SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
2020-02-27SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
2020-02-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-02-11SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 189
2020-02-10HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 246
2020-02-10HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 244 Amendment 1013D
2020-02-07HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 232
2020-02-05HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2020-02-05HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1013C
2020-02-05HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1013B
2020-02-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-01-29HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-01-15HouseReferred to House Judiciary H.J. 19
2020-01-14HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 11

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1013&Session=2020
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/61817.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/66565.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/67347.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/69166.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=32399&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=32713&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=33943&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34108&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=35043&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=35087&Session=2020

Bill Comments

feedback