SD HB1012 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Protect students and employees at institutions of higher education from divisive concepts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protect students and employees at institutions of higher education from divisive concepts.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2022-03-08 - House - Concurred in amendments (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-28HouseSigned by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688
2022-03-10HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 686
2022-03-10SenateSigned by the President S.J. 536
2022-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 684
2022-03-08HouseHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 10. H.J. 633
2022-03-07SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 478
2022-03-03SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 456
2022-03-01SenateEducation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3.
2022-03-01SenateEducation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1012D
2022-03-01SenateScheduled for hearing
2022-02-16SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 275
2022-02-15HouseHouse of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 329 Amendment 1012C
2022-02-15HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 14. H.J. 329
2022-02-14HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 280
2022-02-09HouseEducation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 2.
2022-02-09HouseEducation Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 4. Amendment 1012B
2022-02-09HouseEducation Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 2. Amendment 1012A
2022-02-09HouseScheduled for hearing
2022-01-14HouseReferred to House Education H.J. 29
2022-01-11HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 7

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://sdlegislature.gov/#/Session/Bill/23006
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/226040.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/233030.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/233755.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/235332.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/236257.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/231112.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/232983.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/233697.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/235061.pdf
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/73146
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/73149
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/73150
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/73811
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/74958
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/75385
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/75424

Bill Comments

feedback