SD HB1012 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2021 H.J. 260
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2021 H.J. 260
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Update references to certain federal motor carrier regulations.
Title
Update references to certain federal motor carrier regulations.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2021 H.J. 260 |
2021-02-03 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 03, 2021 H.J. 188 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 160 |
2021-02-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 164 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 136 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-21 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 88 |
2021-01-20 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 53 |
2021-01-19 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent H.J. 1 |
2021-01-19 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2021-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-12 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 15 |