SD HB1012 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2018 H.J. 795
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding political party status and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding political party status and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26SenateSigned by the Governor on March 21, 2018 H.J. 795
2018-03-06SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 06, 2018 H.J. 701
2018-03-05SenateSigned by the President S.J. 704
2018-02-28SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 653
2018-02-27SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 618
2018-02-26SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 596
2018-02-26SenateScheduled for hearing
2018-02-21SenateDeferred by Chair
2018-02-21SenateScheduled for hearing
2018-01-31SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 296
2018-01-30HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 227
2018-01-25HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 215
2018-01-24HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 164
2018-01-24HouseScheduled for hearing
2018-01-22HouseDeferred by Chair
2018-01-22HouseScheduled for hearing
2018-01-18HouseScheduled for hearing
2018-01-17HouseReferred to House State Affairs, Passed H.J. 73
2018-01-09HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 19

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1012&Session=2018
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/HB1012P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/HB1012ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24812&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25008&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24812&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25008&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26373&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26472&Session=2018

Bill Comments

feedback