SD HB1012 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Signed by Governor H.J. 676
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Signed by Governor H.J. 676
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for free resident fishing licenses for certain entities teaching basic fishing skills.
Title
Provide for free resident fishing licenses for certain entities teaching basic fishing skills.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 676 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 637 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 524 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 594 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 486 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 467 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 441 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 416 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 391 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 372 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 354 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 336 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 318 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 300 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 276 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 262 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 235 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 171 |
2014-01-29 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 160 |
2014-01-28 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-01-28 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 112 |
2014-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-14 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 18 |