SD HB1012 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - Signed by Governor H.J. 454
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - Signed by Governor H.J. 454
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require public hearings for applications for oil and gas orders only if contested and to reduce the number of hearing notice publications required for oil and gas cases.
Title
Require public hearings for applications for oil and gas orders only if contested and to reduce the number of hearing notice publications required for oil and gas cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | Signed by Governor H.J. 454 | |
2012-02-07 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 349 | |
2012-02-06 | Signed by President S.J. 286 | |
2012-02-02 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 307 | |
2012-02-01 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 246 | |
2012-01-31 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-01-31 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 226 | |
2012-01-31 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-24 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 157 | |
2012-01-23 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 17. H.J. 163 | |
2012-01-19 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-01-19 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 51 | |
2012-01-19 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-10 | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 17 |