SD HB1010 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2018 H.J. 394
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2018 H.J. 394
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding federal protections for National Guard members ordered to active duty.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding federal protections for National Guard members ordered to active duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2018 H.J. 394 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 07, 2018 H.J. 366 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 394 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 347 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 355 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 315 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Military and Veterans Affairs S.J. 201 |
2018-01-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 0. H.J. 131 |
2018-01-19 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-01-19 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 105 |
2018-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 66 |
2018-01-09 | House | First Reading House H.J. 19 |