SD HB1010 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 2, 2017 H.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 2, 2017 H.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Board of Regents to contract for the construction of the NSU Regional Science Education Center at Northern State University and to make an appropriation therefor.
Title
Authorize the Board of Regents to contract for the construction of the NSU Regional Science Education Center at Northern State University and to make an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 2, 2017 H.J. 618 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 28, 2017 H.J. 582 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 577 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 540 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 526 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 500 |
2017-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 9. H.J. 431 |
2017-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 421 |
2017-02-15 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 410 |
2017-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 393 |
2017-02-09 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 1. H.J. 358 |
2017-02-09 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1010za |
2017-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-10 | House | First read in House and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 19 |