SD HB1009 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Signed by Governor H.J. 438
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Signed by Governor H.J. 438
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal the authority of the Department of Environment and Natural Resources to regulate public swimming places and bulk water haulers.
Title
Repeal the authority of the Department of Environment and Natural Resources to regulate public swimming places and bulk water haulers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Signed by Governor H.J. 438 | |
2011-02-15 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 404 | |
2011-02-14 | Signed by President S.J. 423 | |
2011-02-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 359 | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 387 | |
2011-02-08 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 353 | |
2011-01-25 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 200 | |
2011-01-24 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 9. H.J. 157 | |
2011-01-21 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 132 | |
2011-01-20 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 117 | |
2011-01-20 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-11 | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 22 |