SD HB1008 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2020 H.J. 630
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Legalize the growth, production, and transportation of industrial hemp in the state, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legalize the growth, production, and transportation of industrial hemp in the state, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 54 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30SenateSigned by the Governor on March 27, 2020 H.J. 630
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President S.J. 552
2020-03-12SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 620
2020-03-12SenateSenate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 3. S.J. 551
2020-03-12SenateHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 9. H.J. 595
2020-03-11SenateSenate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 486
2020-03-10SenateHouse of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 542
2020-03-10SenateHouse of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 544
2020-03-09SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 9. S.J. 467
2020-03-09SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 467 Amendment 1008H
2020-03-05SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 436
2020-02-26SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 353
2020-02-25SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
2020-02-25SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-02-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 205
2020-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 12. H.J. 260
2020-02-10HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 249
2020-02-06HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0.
2020-02-06HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1008B
2020-02-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-02-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-01-30HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-01-16HouseReferred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 27
2020-01-14HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 11

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1008&Session=2020
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/61810.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/66931.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/69809.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/70020.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/70024.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=32458&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=32847&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=33761&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34611&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34810&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34961&Session=2020

Bill Comments

feedback