SD HB1008 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 9, NAYS 25. S.J. 470
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 9, NAYS 25. S.J. 470
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions that authorize the secretary of transportation to provide for temporary variable speed limits on state highways in the interests of highway safety due to varying weather, road work, and other conditions.
Title
Revise certain provisions that authorize the secretary of transportation to provide for temporary variable speed limits on state highways in the interests of highway safety due to varying weather, road work, and other conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 9, NAYS 25. S.J. 470 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Deferred with pending amendment (Rule 5-17), Passed S.J. 438 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 422 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 396 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 296 |
2018-01-30 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 16. H.J. 226 |
2018-01-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 215 |
2018-01-23 | House | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 142 |
2018-01-23 | House | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1008oa |
2018-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-18 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2018-01-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 18 |